IN HB1170 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 211
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that, with respect to a regional water, sewage, or solid waste district in which a majority of ratepayers and property owners are not individuals, only an individual who is registered to vote at an address located in the district may be appointed as a trustee of the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional district trustees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 117002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 117001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 211
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-12HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 304: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-28HouseSenator Skinner added as second sponsor.
2014-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-28HouseSenator Boots added as sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-27HouseRepresentative Heaton added as coauthor.
2014-01-27HouseRepresentative Morrison added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-13HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Kersey.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1170/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/7/a/b97ac051/HB1170.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/a/e/a7aee484/HB1170.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/c/4/b9c44547/HB1170.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/f/a/29fac71c/HB1170.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/5/6/e456c248/HB1170.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/1/c0516eef/HB1170.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/2/9/4a29f81f/HB1170.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/1/4/af14695e/HB1170.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/2/6/ad261eca/HB1170.02.COMH.82.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/5/6/7e56407f/HB1170.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/0/7/3107e5c1/HB1170.03.COMS.304.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback