IN HB1170 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expands training assistance under the training 2000 program to provide assistance to: (1) new or expanding businesses for the training or retraining of incumbent employees; and (2) any business in Indiana for the retraining and upgrading of employee skills required to support existing capital investment. (Current law restricts training assistance under the training 2000 program to potential employees of new or expanding business and to the retraining and upgrading of skills required to support new capital investment.)
Title
Training 2000 program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 67 |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology |
2013-01-24 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-01-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Representatives Clere and Battles added as coauthors |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Heuer |