IN HB1170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for the first two years after a local option income tax for public safety (public safety LOIT) is adopted, a county or municipality that receives revenue from a public safety LOIT may use the public safety LOIT only to increase the total amount available for expenditure for public safety purposes. Provides that for the first two years after a public safety LOIT is adopted, the public safety LOIT may not be used to reduce or replace revenue devoted to public safety purposes from any other source of revenue.
Title
Public safety local option income tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-03-28 | Senate sponsor: Senator Banks | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 84, nays 13 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-10 | Coauthored by Representatives Leonard and Tyler | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Morris |