IN HB1169 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Department of health matters. Repeals and relocates laws concerning: (1) rules regulating the sanitary operation of tattoo parlors and body piercing facilities; (2) allowing the executive board of the state department of health (board) to adopt rules on behalf of the state department of health (department); (3) allowing the board to adopt emergency rules; (4) sanitation of public buildings and institutions; and (5) authority to adopt rules concerning the federal Clinical Laboratory Improvement Amendments. Repeals laws concerning: (1) safety guidelines for children during bad weather conditions; (2) automated external defibrillator rules in health clubs; (3) requiring the state health commissioner (commissioner) to comment on certain rules; (4) fees for serological tests; (5) the administrative unit for special institutions; (6) protection and regulation of department property; and (7) the registry of blind persons. Removes intemperance as a reason to remove a local health officer. Specifies that the department may request the office of administrative law proceedings to designate a person to administer a proceeding. Requires the department to provide facilities and disseminate information to the public concerning oral public health. Allows the department to have a designee to maintain a 24 hour poisons answering service. Adds information on prenatal care to the department's telephone information service concerning children with long term health care needs. Changes the reference from "illegal drug use" to "substance use disorder" for purposes of partnership and joint ventures with the department. Requires the department to employ a licensed physician as the chief medical officer. Allows the chief medical officer to perform the functions of the commissioner when the commissioner is not available. Specifies that the state health laboratory (laboratory) must be used to support public health. Changes the title of the person who manages the laboratory. Removes certain requirements concerning the appointment of the laboratory director and chemist. Removes a requirement that a director must report to the commissioner. Requires holders of a certificate of public advantage to pay for reasonable charges incurred by the department. Changes the requirement that the department "shall" to "may" use information compiled by a public or private entity to the greatest extent possible to develop a chronic disease registry. Allows the department to issue a certificate of free sale to a business that meets certain requirements. Amends the definition of "person" for purposes of the state health improvement plan and grant program. Amends the definition of "deaf or hard of hearing" for purposes of the laws governing language development for children who are deaf or hard of hearing. Provides that a county coroner may not certify the cause of death for certain infants as a sudden unexplained infant death until a comprehensive death investigation is performed. Makes technical and conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-24HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-20HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-13HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2022-01-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2022-01-06HouseCoauthored by Representatives Barrett, Lehman, Fleming
2022-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1169/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/6/2/ff6296cb/HB1169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/f/4/cef49287/HB1169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/1/d/2c1d7096/HB1169.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/5/8/ec585754/HB1169.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/3/f/c63fe87e/HB1169.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/a/4/a7a4f3f1/HB1169.04.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/d/d/1adde550/HB1169.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/3/a/253aacab/HB1169.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/a/6/31a69409/HB1169.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/7/2/3072fc3f/HB1169.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/2/0/fd20d538/HB1169.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/4/9/53496ea6/HB1169.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/0/7b30b7cb/HB1169.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/3/b633ecdb/HB1169.04.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/3/44333c85/HB1169.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/d/1/48d1af04/HB1169.02.COMH.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback