IN HB1169 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Business personal property tax exemption. Replaces the requirement that a taxpayer that is eligible for the business personal property tax exemption (exemption) submit to the county assessor a notarized statement each year affirming the taxpayer's eligibility for the exemption, subject to penalties for perjury, with a requirement that the taxpayer indicate on the taxpayer's personal property return that the taxpayer is eligible for the exemption for the assessment date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business personal property tax exemption. Replaces the requirement that a taxpayer that is eligible for the business personal property tax exemption (exemption) submit to the county assessor a notarized statement each year affirming the taxpayer's eligibility for the exemption, subject to penalties for perjury, with a requirement that the taxpayer indicate on the taxpayer's personal property return that the taxpayer is eligible for the exemption for the assessment date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 199
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 239: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-02-23HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-02-23SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-27HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-26HouseRepresentatives Richardson and Klinker added as coauthors
2016-01-26HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Hershman and Leising
2016-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 96, nays 0
2016-01-25HouseAmendment #2 (Forestal) ruled out of order
2016-01-25HouseAmendment #1 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1169/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/0/9/810922e5/HB1169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/a/9/15a96a8d/HB1169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/0/d/b70d4c22/HB1169.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/e/9/5ae92d57/HB1169.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/2/d/502d053e/HB1169.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/7/d/327d1ad0/HB1169.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/2/f/9e2ff7c7/HB1169.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/d/9/30d95812/HB1169.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/3/9/9d390deb/HB1169.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/1/2/9e12e09f/HB1169.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/7/b/277b0be5/HB1169.67.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/8/9/55898353/HB1169.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/e/9/e7e99da9/HB1169.192.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/d/a/06dab1eb/HB1169.239.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback