IN HB1166 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax representatives and assessor competency. Provides that certified level two assessor-appraisers and certified level three assessor-appraisers may serve as tax representatives under certain circumstances. Provides that a taxpayer may submit a written complaint to the department of local government finance if the taxpayer has reason to believe the assessing official failed to adhere to Uniform Standards of Professional Appraisal Practice or does not have the necessary competency to perform the assessment. Provides that notice of a taxpayer's right to submit a written complaint must be included on the taxpayer's notice of assessment or reassessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax representatives and assessor competency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 178
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-22SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 496: yeas 38, nays 11
2021-04-22HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 503: yeas 68, nays 29
2021-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-21SenateSenator Rogers added as conferee
2021-04-21SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2021-04-21HouseRepresentative Heine added as conferee
2021-04-21HouseRepresentative Pryor removed as conferee
2021-04-21HouseRepresentative Heine removed as advisor
2021-04-19SenateSenate advisors appointed: Houchin and Qaddoura
2021-04-19SenateSenate conferees appointed: Holdman and Lanane
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Abbott, Heine, Harris and Klinker
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Soliday and Pryor
2021-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 408: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-08SenateSenator Koch added as cosponsor
2021-04-08SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-08SenateAmendment #2 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-06SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-04-06SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-22SenateSenator Rogers added as third sponsor
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Houchin
2021-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 71, nays 22
2021-02-09HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Judy, May, Slager, Cherry, Prescott, Klinker added as coauthors
2021-02-09HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Heine and Aylesworth
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1166/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/3/91838152/HB1166.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/7/d/787dd21d/HB1166.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/f/4/26f490fd/HB1166.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/d/9/ddd97586/HB1166.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/7/6/9b76da6c/HB1166.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/7/b/697bdef4/HB1166.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/c/d/dbcd7761/HB1166.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/e/f/66ef8a64/HB1166.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/b/1/82b1eb4e/HB1166.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/a/6/dca6ab82/HB1166.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/d/7/16d77cf5/HB1166.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/0/c/a10c4018/HB1166.03.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/c/8/05c81126/HB1166.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/6/8/4d68fc6f/HB1166.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/9/5/1795e3ca/HB1166.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/7/c/867c1cd7/HB1166.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/9/c/389cac50/HB1166.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/6/7/3967b48a/HB1166.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/f/3/02f3a164/HB1166.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/7/e/297ec5e6/HB1166.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/1/e/0d1e5c53/HB1166.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/9/f/a09f25fb/HB1166.04.ENGS.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/0/c/b10c3159/HB1166.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/a/f/88affd0d/HB1166.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/2/e/c32e4bd6/HB1166.105_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/d/9/e6d9cf6a/HB1166.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/d/3/b8d3b160/HB1166.408_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/a/f/dfafd4e2/HB1166.503_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/5/7/7d571676/HB1166.496_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback