IN HB1166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Redevelopment commission membership. After December 31, 2019, increases by one member, the membership of a municipal or county redevelopment commission (commission). Requires a municipal or county executive to appoint one member to the redevelopment commission who is a school board member. Provides that if there is more than one school corporation within redevelopment commission territory, the member must be: (1) a member of the school board of the school corporation having the largest average daily membership (ADM); or (2) a member of the school board of another school corporation within the commission's territory who is recommended by the school board described in (1). Effective January 1, 2020, eliminates the appointment of and term of office of a nonvoting adviser to the commission. Provides that the executive of the municipality for a municipal redevelopment commission, or the president of the county executive for a county redevelopment commission, serves as an ex officio member of the commission to cast the deciding vote to break a tie.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redevelopment commission membership. After December 31, 2019, increases by one member, the membership of a municipal or county redevelopment commission (commission). Requires a municipal or county executive to appoint one member to the redevelopment commission who is a school board member. Provides that if there is more than one school corporation within redevelopment commission territory, the member must be: (1) a member of the school board of the school corporation having the largest average daily membership (ADM); or (2) a member of the school board of another school corporation within the commission's territory who is recommended by the school board described in (1). Effective January 1, 2020, eliminates the appointment of and term of office of a nonvoting adviser to the commission. Provides that the executive of the municipality for a municipal redevelopment commission, or the president of the county executive for a county redevelopment commission, serves as an ex officio member of the commission to cast the deciding vote to break a tie.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseReassigned to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representative Mahan
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback