IN HB1164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
Pending: Senate Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Various utility matters. Exempts a contract for the lease of state property under which no state expenditures are required from provisions: (1) requiring certain disclosures and certifications by a prospective state contractor regarding violations of Indiana telephone solicitation and automated calling statutes; (2) regarding cancellation of public purchasing contracts due to lack of funds; (3) regarding state contractor use of the E-Verify program; and (4) prohibiting state contractor employment of unauthorized aliens. Provides that: (1) rural electric cooperatives; and (2) municipalities providing electric service; shall permit attachments by communications service providers to poles owned or controlled by the cooperatives or municipalities. Provides that any pole attachment rental fee imposed by a rural electric cooperative or a municipality: (1) must be calculated on an annual, per-pole basis; and (2) is considered to provide reasonable compensation and to be nondiscriminatory, just, and reasonable if the fee: (A) is agreed upon by the parties; or (B) is not greater than the fee that would apply if the fee were calculated in accordance with the formula applied by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC). Amends the procedures under which a public utility applies to a municipality or county executive for authorization to occupy and perform work in a public right-of-way controlled by the municipality or county executive, and provides for restrictions on the requirements a municipality or county executive may impose for purposes of granting such authority. Provides that the Indiana utility regulatory commission (IURC) may not require a communications service provider to: (1) file a tariff; or (2) report to the IURC any information that is: (A) available to the public on the communications service provider's Internet web site; (B) filed with the FCC; or (C) otherwise available to the public; except as required by the IURC to respond to consumer complaints or information requests from the general assembly. Amends the factors that must exist for a permit authority to prohibit the placement of a new utility pole or wireless support structure for purposes of construction, placement, or use of a small cell facility or structure in an area that is: (1) within a right-of-way; and (2) designated strictly for underground or buried utilities. Provides that a permit authority may not impose: (1) a restriction on maximum height of a wireless support structure, subject to certain federal regulations and state laws; or (2) a requirement regarding minimum separation distances between wireless support structures. Provides that a tariff filed with the IURC by a communications service provider is effective upon filing. Provides that a video service provider is not required to provide the IURC with information describing the provider's programming, including the provider's channel lineups or channel guides. Exempts a political subdivision's disposal of property by sale, exchange, transfer, or lease of the property to a public utility or a communications service provider from certain provisions regarding disposal of property by a political subdivision. Provides an exemption to the public works law for certain work done by the employees of a conservancy district established for the purpose of water or sewage treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various utility matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseCosponsor: Senator Donato
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Koch, Houchin
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 54, nays 39
2021-02-18HouseRepresentative Soliday added as coauthor
2021-02-18HouseRepresentative Lauer added as coauthor
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Manning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1164/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/b/f/a1bfb3ba/HB1164.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/b/c/8bbcbcf1/HB1164.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/7/fd67bfa1/HB1164.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/5/d/2c5d647a/HB1164.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/f/0/eff09228/HB1164.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/b/e/83befd1d/HB1164.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/f/c/b6fc432f/HB1164.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/5/0/f050a1cc/HB1164.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/c/1/37c1f41a/HB1164.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/e/d/eaedec68/HB1164.227_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback