IN HB1164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers. Adds gaming agents and gaming control officers to the definition of "police officer" for purposes of the statute providing a sentence enhancement for individuals who point a firearm or discharge a firearm at a police officer while committing certain crimes.
Title
Law enforcement officers. Adds gaming agents and gaming control officers to the definition of "police officer" for purposes of the statute providing a sentence enhancement for individuals who point a firearm or discharge a firearm at a police officer while committing certain crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 157 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 357: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Holdman |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 71, nays 23 |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | House | Representatives Truitt, Morris, Stemler added as coauthors |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan |