IN HB1162 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the utility regulatory commission to make additional findings before granting a certificate of public convenience and necessity to an applicant that proposes to construct a facility with a generating capacity of more than 80 megawatts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificates of need for utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Roll Call 116202 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Roll Call 116201 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 210
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 303: yeas 46 and nays 2
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Leising added second sponsor.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 183: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-02-03HouseSenator Merritt added as sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Negele added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Koch added as coauthor.
2014-01-13HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities and Energy
2014-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Braun.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1162/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/5/3/57530e7e/HB1162.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/6/5/fe6504c5/HB1162.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/7/1/c9711697/HB1162.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/7/9/cc795a47/HB1162.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/7/0/62702f09/HB1162.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/9/4/679429d9/HB1162.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/4/5/5145f861/HB1162.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/e/d/6fedb1e1/HB1162.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/e/f/35efd5b0/HB1162.02.COMH.182.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/5/d/445d724d/HB1162.02.COMH.183.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/f/c/ebfc03ae/HB1162.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/2/f/a42f89e7/HB1162.03.COMS.303.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback