IN HB1161 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 84: Yeas 40, Nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that after June 30, 2010, a person may not, within two miles of the boundary of a state park or reservoir operated, maintained, or managed by the department of natural resources: (1) apply manure; or (2) start construction of a confined feeding operation. Provides an exception to the manure application restriction for a postsecondary educational institution that conducts agricultural research. Provides that the construction limitation does not apply to the expansion of a confined feeding operation or the expansion of an agricultural operation that will become a confined feeding operation as a result of the expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confined feeding operation setbacks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-28 Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 84: Yeas 40, Nays 57
2010-01-25 Amendment 1 (Pflum), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Representatives Saunders and Cheatham added as coauthors
2010-01-20 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Pflum

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback