IN HB1159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protective orders and employment. Provides that an employer may not terminate an employee based on the filing, by the employee, of a petition for a protective order.
Title
Protective orders and employment. Provides that an employer may not terminate an employee based on the filing, by the employee, of a petition for a protective order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 182 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 524: yeas 33, nays 12 |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 550: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Rogers and Merritt |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Banks A and Arnold J |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Lehman, Frye R, Klinker and Moseley |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Judy and Macer |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 344: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Ford added as cosponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third sponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Representatives Brown, C., Pryor, Richardson, Behning, Saunders, Cook added as coauthorss |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Bosma added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Arnold added second sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Banks A added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Judy) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Representatives Macer and Klinker added as coauthorss |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2015-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Judy |
2015-01-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |