IN HB1158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Representative Huston added as coauthor
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair and open competition for public works projects. Provides that a public agency may not do any of the following: (1) Require a potential bidder on a public works project to provide any information that the potential bidder considers confidential or proprietary as a requirement for the public agency finding the bidder to be a responsive or responsible bidder. (2) By rule, ordinance, or any other action relating to contracts for public works projects for which competitive bids are required impose any requirement that directly or indirectly restricts potential bidders to any predetermined class of bidders defined by experience on similar projects, size of company, union membership, or any other criteria. (3) Take certain actions based on a bidder's, offeror's, or contractor's entering into, refusing to enter into, adhering to, or refusing to adhere to an agreement with a labor organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair and open competition for public works projects. Provides that a public agency may not do any of the following: (1) Require a potential bidder on a public works project to provide any information that the potential bidder considers confidential or proprietary as a requirement for the public agency finding the bidder to be a responsive or responsible bidder. (2) By rule, ordinance, or any other action relating to contracts for public works projects for which competitive bids are required impose any requirement that directly or indirectly restricts potential bidders to any predetermined class of bidders defined by experience on similar projects, size of company, union membership, or any other criteria. (3) Take certain actions based on a bidder's, offeror's, or contractor's entering into, refusing to enter into, adhering to, or refusing to adhere to an agreement with a labor organization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Huston added as coauthor
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Torr added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Miller D

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback