IN HB1157 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Residential housing development program. Makes the following changes regarding Marion County redevelopment: (1) Revises allocation area requirements for the redevelopment commission (commission) to establish a housing program. (2) Allows the commission to establish a residential housing development program (residential housing program) and a tax increment funding allocation area for the residential housing program, if the construction of new houses fails to reach a benchmark. Requires the department of local government finance, in cooperation with the city of Indianapolis, to determine eligibility for the residential housing program. Specifies the rights, powers, privileges, and immunities of the commission in implementing a residential housing program.
Title
Residential housing development program.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Renee Pack [D] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Sen. Kyle Walker [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Andrea Hunley [D] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] |
Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 126 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 449: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2023-04-13 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 341: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 332: yeas 16, nays 32 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Hunley added as third sponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second sponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura removed as third sponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Hunley removed as second sponsor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker K, Hunley, Qaddoura |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | House | Representative May added as coauthor |
2023-01-23 | House | Representatives Miller D and Pack R added as coauthors |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Moed |
Subjects
BONDS, Financial
CIVIL ACTIONS, Immunity and Exemption from Liability
ELECTIONS, Vacancies in Office; Vacancies on the Ballot
HOUSING
INDIANAPOLIS
LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND FINANCE, DEPARTMENT OF (DLGF)
PROPERTY TAXES generally
CIVIL ACTIONS, Immunity and Exemption from Liability
ELECTIONS, Vacancies in Office; Vacancies on the Ballot
HOUSING
INDIANAPOLIS
LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND FINANCE, DEPARTMENT OF (DLGF)
PROPERTY TAXES generally