IN HB1157 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle and criminal law issues. Increases the penalty for numerous motor vehicle violations from a Class C infraction to a Class A infraction if the violation results in bodily injury. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to remove any record of a suspension from a defendant charged with operating while intoxicated if the case ends in favor of the defendant and the defendant's driving privileges were suspended because: (1) the defendant refused a chemical test; or (2) the results of a chemical test resulted in prima facie evidence of intoxication. Provides that a court and the bureau, if applicable, shall terminate all or any part of the remaining suspension of a person's license suspension if: (1) the charges against the person are dismissed; (2) the person is acquitted; or (3) the person's conviction is vacated or reversed on appeal. Provides that a court shall terminate a suspension imposed for refusal to submit to a chemical test if: (1) the court accepts a plea agreement between the state and the defendant that includes this provision; or (2) the court finds at sentencing that terminating the remaining suspension is in the best interests of society. Adds cross references concerning license suspensions and ignition interlock devices. Makes an individual less than 18 years of age eligible for a deferral program. (Under current law, individuals under 18 years of age are not eligible for deferral.) Repeals certain driving privilege suspensions when a motor vehicle is used in dealing certain controlled substances. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle and criminal law issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 110
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 370: yeas 44, nays 4
2020-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 354: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Young M, Randolph Lonnie M and Zay
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Freeman and Tallian
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sullivan, Young J, Hatcher and Shackleford
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatfield
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 37, nays 13
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #1 (Buchanan) failed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateSenator Tallian added as second sponsor
2020-02-11SenateSenator Freeman added as sponsor
2020-02-11SenateSenator Tallian removed as sponsor
2020-02-11SenateSenator Freeman removed as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Tallian and Freeman
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 93, nays 1
2020-01-21HouseRepresentatives McNamara, Bartels, Shackleford added as coauthors
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Hatfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1157/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/b/d/e1bd49af/HB1157.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/b/5/2ab59eb2/HB1157.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/c/1/09c17d76/HB1157.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/7/d/5d7d2bce/HB1157.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/b/c/3dbcabee/HB1157.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/e/a/87ea416f/HB1157.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/3/d/073d2e9c/HB1157.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/5/e/1a5e8ed5/HB1157.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/3/0/99301a41/HB1157.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/c/5/f9c5fd80/HB1157.50_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/c/a/b4ca437e/HB1157.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/d/0/a4d06bb3/HB1157.294_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/6/c/d26c7630/HB1157.354_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/9/8/249863a3/HB1157.370_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback