IN HB1157 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Various election law matters.
Title
Various election law matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 219 |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 556: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 625: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Pat Miller, Lanane and Head |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Landske and Tallian |
2013-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: M. Smith, Mayfield, Battles, GiaQuinta and Goodin |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Richardson and Bartlett |
2013-04-18 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as second sponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Banks), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-29 | House | Representatives GiaQuinta and Thompson added as coauthors |
2013-01-29 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Landske |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Richardson |