IN HB1156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibition on microchipping employees. Provides that the definition of an "employer" subject to the prohibition against requiring the implantation of devices includes the state or any individual, partnership, association, limited liability company, corporation, business trust, or other governmental entity or political subdivision that has one or more employees.
Title
Prohibition on microchipping employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Public Law 35 |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Morris and Goodrich |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Morrison |