IN HB1155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Returned to the House with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Clark County circuit court. Establishes two new courts beginning July 1, 2019. Requires the governor to fill the vacancy in each of the courts that occurs when the court comes into existence. Provides that the first elected judges under the Indiana Constitution are elected at the November 2024 general election, take office January 1, 2025, and each hold office for a term of six years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clark County circuit court. Establishes two new courts beginning July 1, 2019. Requires the governor to fill the vacancy in each of the courts that occurs when the court comes into existence. Provides that the first elected judges under the Indiana Constitution are elected at the November 2024 general election, take office January 1, 2025, and each hold office for a term of six years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Garten, Grooms and Young M
2019-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-02-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-04HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Fleming added as coauthor
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseRepresentatives Davisson and Engleman added as coauthors
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Goodin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1155/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/e/9/7be97357/HB1155.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/f/a/3ffa4a99/HB1155.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/0/b/870b9dc4/HB1155.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/e/c/5dec93ee/HB1155.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/9/6/3496fa2a/HB1155.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/6/2/ad620345/HB1155.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/4/9/bb494cb0/HB1155.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/e/c/daec6e49/HB1155.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/2/5/a925e4e8/HB1155.05.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/c/9/b0c951bb/HB1155.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/a/0/34a0655a/HB1155.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/7/f/d47f3127/HB1155.130.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/7/b/c57bcf7f/HB1155.03.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/2/6a1208a7/HB1155.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/3/2/293218bb/HB1155.319.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback