IN HB1154 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local airport authorities. Provides that a member (member) of a governing body of an airport authority or a department of aviation (governing body) may participate in a board meeting by electronic communication. Defines "commercial aeronautics" for purposes of serving on a governing body. Provides that a member may not have a pecuniary (rather than a personal) interest in a contract with or claim against the governing body.
Title
Local airport authorities. Provides that a member (member) of a governing body of an airport authority or a department of aviation (governing body) may participate in a board meeting by electronic communication. Defines "commercial aeronautics" for purposes of serving on a governing body. Provides that a member may not have a pecuniary (rather than a personal) interest in a contract with or claim against the governing body.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Braun [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 154 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 356: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Arnold removed as cosponsor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler |
2016-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Representatives Truitt and Riecken added as coauthors |
2016-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Braun |