IN HB1153 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Governor's workforce cabinet. Provides that the governor's workforce cabinet (cabinet) shall, on or before December 1, 2020, create a comprehensive strategic plan to ensure alignment of Indiana's primary, secondary, and postsecondary education systems with Indiana's workforce training programs and employer needs. Requires the cabinet to include early childhood education in the cabinet's: (1) systematic and comprehensive review to determine whether Indiana's educational system is aligned with employer needs; and (2) comprehensive strategic plan to ensure alignment of Indiana's educational system with employer needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor's workforce cabinet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 109
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 369: yeas 41, nays 8
2020-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 361: yeas 93, nays 1
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Koch, Mrvan and Kruse
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Behning, Cook, Pfaff and Smith V
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Goodrich and Klinker
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 44, nays 6
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateSenator Koch added as third sponsor
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-20SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 96, nays 1
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Lucas added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2020-01-15HouseRepresentative Behning added as coauthor
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Goodrich

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1153/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/3/c/0e3cce5f/HB1153.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/e/4/ffe43424/HB1153.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/8/0/0280b27a/HB1153.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/c/0/fcc01b8d/HB1153.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/e/f/02efbf64/HB1153.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/1/e/a51e9a79/HB1153.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/3/8/e538c7d3/HB1153.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/4/7/a2470b24/HB1153.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/c/e/a2ce38b8/HB1153.88_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/3/2/da328a0a/HB1153.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/1/9/f419f367/HB1153.293_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/d/2/e4d25cab/HB1153.361_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/0/2/dc02dd82/HB1153.369_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback