IN HB1152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Representative McNamara added as coauthor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Representative McNamara added as coauthor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student hunger and homelessness. Establishes the student hunger and homelessness study committee (committee) for the purposes of: (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana colleges and universities during the 2019 academic year; and (2) providing suggestions for eliminating those issues. Provides that the study must determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of Indiana college and university students who are homeless, housing insecure, or food insecure. Provides that the committee consists of: (1) an employee of the family and social services administration; (2) an employee of the department of child services; (3) an employee of the department of education; (4) an employee of the commission for higher education; (5) an employee of the Indiana housing and community development authority; (6) a member of the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana; and (7) an employee of each state educational institution. Provides that the committee may solicit assistance from private groups, colleges, and universities in performing the study. Requires the committee to report the results of the study to the governor and the legislative council not later than July 31, 2020.
Title
Student hunger and homelessness. Establishes the student hunger and homelessness study committee (committee) for the purposes of: (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana colleges and universities during the 2019 academic year; and (2) providing suggestions for eliminating those issues. Provides that the study must determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of Indiana college and university students who are homeless, housing insecure, or food insecure. Provides that the committee consists of: (1) an employee of the family and social services administration; (2) an employee of the department of child services; (3) an employee of the department of education; (4) an employee of the commission for higher education; (5) an employee of the Indiana housing and community development authority; (6) a member of the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana; and (7) an employee of each state educational institution. Provides that the committee may solicit assistance from private groups, colleges, and universities in performing the study. Requires the committee to report the results of the study to the governor and the legislative council not later than July 31, 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2019-01-15 | House | Representative DeVon added as coauthor |
2019-01-14 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Harris |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1152/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/1/7/5c170c0c/HB1152.01.INTR.pdf |