IN HB1152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of occupational therapy.
Title
Practice of occupational therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-02-20 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Representatives Bacon and Klinker added as coauthors |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |