IN HB1151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Representative Davis added as coauthor
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Representative Davis added as coauthor
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a physical therapist to evaluate and treat a patient without a referral for not more than 30 days. Requires a physical therapist to obtain a referral from the patient's provider if further treatment by the physical therapist is needed.
Title
Physical therapy services without a referral.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Representative Davis added as coauthor | |
2011-01-27 | Representative Morris added as coauthor | |
2011-01-11 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Representative Frizzell |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1151 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1151.1.html |