IN HB1149 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home based vendors. Specifies the requirements for the preparation and sale of food products as a home based vendor. Reorganizes provisions concerning the sale of certain food products by an individual vendor at a farmers' market or roadside stand. Requires an individual who sells poultry, rabbits, and eggs at a farmers' market or roadside stand to comply with certain requirements. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Home based vendors.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. J. Michael Davisson [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Public Law 49 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 311: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senator Walker G added as second sponsor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Leising |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Clere, Davisson J., Bauer M |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |