IN HB1149 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking: (1) in public places; (2) in enclosed areas of a place of employment; (3) in certain state vehicles; and (4) within 8 feet of a public entrance to a public place or an enclosed area of a place of employment. Allows smoking in certain: (1) gaming facilities; (2) cigar and hookah bars; (3) fraternal, social, and veterans clubs; (4) tobacco stores; (5) bars and taverns; (6) cigar manufacturer facilities; and (7) cigar specialty stores; if certain requirements are met. Allows smoking on the premises of a business that is located in the business owner's residence if certain requirements are met. Requires certain signs to be posted. Requires the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) to enforce this prohibition. Allows certain governmental agencies and law enforcement officers to enforce the prohibition. Makes it a Class B infraction to violate the smoking prohibition and a Class A infraction if the person has been adjudged to have committed three prior unrelated infractions for violations. Prohibits firing, refusing to hire, or retaliating against a person for reporting a violation or exercising any right or performing any obligation under the smoking prohibition. Requires the commission to present an annual report to the health finance commission. Removes the authority of the director of the division of mental health and addiction to regulate smoking within certain state institutions. Provides authority for a physician to prescribe smoking cessation devices to residents of state institutions. (Current law allows prescribing nicotine patches.) Moves the prohibition against smoking on a school bus during the school week to IC 7.1. Repeals the current clean indoor air law. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Smoking ban.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 29 (Young R Michael), prevailed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 29 (Young R Michael), prevailed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 345: yeas 28, nays 22 | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 379: yeas 60, nays 33 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-02 | Senate advisor appointed: Alting and Lanane | |
2012-03-02 | Senate conferee appointed: Gard and Simpson | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: T. Brown, VanNatter and Welch | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Turner and C. Brown | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 29 and nays 21 | |
2012-02-29 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); Technical Corrections. | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 17 (Leising), failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 17, nays 32 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 19 (Buck), failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 16, nays 31 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 15 (Leising), failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 16, nays 33 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 22 (Alting), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 13 (Leising), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 28, nays 16 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 21 (Gard), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 24 (Gard), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 23 (Alting), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 20 (Leising), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 6 (Boots), failed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 29 (Young R Michael), prevailed; Roll Call 263: yeas 40, nays 9 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 11 (Holdman), failed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 28 (Nugent), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 18 (Leising), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 26 (Alting), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 27 (Gard), failed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Gard, Alting and Simpson | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 62, nays 35 | |
2012-01-30 | Representative Mahan removed as coauthor | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 2 (VanNatter), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 14 (Turner), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 5 (Turner), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 10 (Turner), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Representatives Austin, Bauer, Burton, Candelaria Reardon, Cherry, Clere, Crawford, Crouch, Day, DeLaney, Dembowski, Dobis, Foley, C. Fry, GiaQuinta, Harris, Karickhoff, L. Lawson, Mahan, Moseley, Moses, Pflum, Pierce, Pryor, Reske, Riecken, M. Smith, V. Smith, Sullivan, Summers and VanDenburgh added as coauthors | |
2012-01-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representatives C. Brown, T. Brown and Welch | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Turner |