IN HB1148 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cannabidiol and treatment resistant epilepsy. Defines "cannabidiol" and "substance containing cannabidiol" and establishes a cannabidiol registry for certain persons for the use of a substance containing cannabidiol in the treatment of an individual with treatment resistant epilepsy. Requires the state department of health to maintain the registry. Provides that the offense of possession of paraphernalia applies to the possession of certain items used in connection with lawfully possessed cannabidiol. Establishes defenses to: (1) possession of marijuana; and (2) an allegation that a person has violated a condition of supervised release; if the charge or violation is based on the use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol and treatment resistant epilepsy. Defines "cannabidiol" and "substance containing cannabidiol" and establishes a cannabidiol registry for certain persons for the use of a substance containing cannabidiol in the treatment of an individual with treatment resistant epilepsy. Requires the state department of health to maintain the registry. Provides that the offense of possession of paraphernalia applies to the possession of certain items used in connection with lawfully possessed cannabidiol. Establishes defenses to: (1) possession of marijuana; and (2) an allegation that a person has violated a condition of supervised release; if the charge or violation is based on the use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HousePublic Law 188
2017-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 522: yeas 100, nays 0
2017-04-20SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 491: yeas 36, nays 13
2017-04-19SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-19HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot, Lanane, Young M and Houchin
2017-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Lehe, Miller D, DeLaney and Klinker
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Friend and Goodin
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 413: yeas 35, nays 13
2017-04-05SenateSenator Boots added as cosponsor
2017-04-05SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2017-04-05SenateAmendment #7 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-16SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-21HouseRepresentative Ellington added as coauthor
2017-02-21HouseRepresentatives Carbaugh and Gutwein added as coauthors
2017-02-21HouseRepresentatives Lucas, Mahan, VanNatter, Taylor J, Beumer, Lehe, Judy, Goodin, Pierce, McNamara, Macer, Engleman, Hamilton, Kirchhofer, Negele, Hamm, Mayfield, Morris, Cook, Klinker, Lawson, Forestal, Frye, Olthoff, Candelaria Reardon, Hatfield, Summers, Brown, C., DeVon, Pressel, Siegrist, Errington, Stemler, Moed, Kersey added as coauthors
2017-02-21HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2017-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Head and Doriot
2017-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 98, nays 0
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-12HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as coauthor
2017-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-01-05HouseCoauthored by Representatives Moseley and Arnold L
2017-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Friend

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1148/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/5/cb958c0d/HB1148.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/5/8/0d58efb5/HB1148.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/4/b/6d4be86f/HB1148.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/1/d/731d93dd/HB1148.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/d/1/fed159ff/HB1148.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/1/3/b2130471/HB1148.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/6/7/6467a11b/HB1148.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/9/f/f99fbc80/HB1148.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/0/5/f1053500/HB1148.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/b/3/3fb3f6d8/HB1148.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/6/e/d06e5bea/HB1148.173.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/a/d/79ad8395/HB1148.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/1/b/571be503/HB1148.413.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/c/c/cecc1bb3/HB1148.491.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/3/6/d6364be4/HB1148.522.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback