IN HB1148 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the examinations for: (1) registration as a professional engineer; and (2) certification as a land surveyor or land surveyor in training; may be computer based. Removes provisions specifying the duration of the examinations. Specifies that an applicant for registration as a professional engineer has three chances to pass the examination for registration, subject to the rules and discretion of the board of registration for professional engineers. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Engineer and land surveyor examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-14 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-13 | Senator Glick added as second sponsor | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2012-01-27 | Senate sponsor: Senator M. Young | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 89, nays 3 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Messmer |