IN HB1147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Seed tests. Requires the state seed commissioner to charge fees for testing seed for purity and germination that are commensurate with fees that are standard in the seed testing industry. Repeals certain requirements for agricultural seed in packages that are not more than one pound. Provides that $25 is the minimum fee to register pure or mixed cultures of microorganisms and materials with the state chemist. Allows the state chemist to adopt rules to establish fees that are necessary for the administration of certain laws concerning the sale and transfer of plant cultures, including costs of inspections, registration of products, and product analysis. Voids rules concerning fees for seed analysis, testing, and examination.
Title
Seed tests.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Public Law 33 |
2022-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second sponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-13 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Leising |
2022-01-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 86, nays 1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-10 | House | Representatives Aylesworth, Cherry, Thompson added as coauthors |
2022-01-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |