IN HB1145 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Gibson and Hamilton County courts. Allows the judges of the Gibson superior court and Gibson circuit court to appoint a magistrate. Allows the appointed magistrate for Gibson County to serve both the Gibson superior court and the Gibson circuit court. Allows the judges of the Hamilton circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Hamilton County courts.
Title
Gibson and Hamilton County courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Tomes |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Representatives Schaibley and McNamara added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2020-01-08 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hostettler |