IN HB1145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Various local government matters.
Title
Various local government matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 72 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 105 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 501: yeas 72, nays 13 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 425: yeas 44 and nays 6 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Paul |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 67, nays 27 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 1 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | House | Representative Hamm added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | House | Representative Heuer removed as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Heuer added as coauthors |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Candelaria Reardon |