IN HB1145 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits a transferee of real property to obtain the benefit of certain property tax deductions in the first full year that the property is owned by the transferee if the transferor would have been eligible for the property tax deductions had the property not been transferred and the property tax assessment board of appeals determines that the property became exempt from property taxation beginning with the first assessment date after the property was transferred to the transferee. Authorizes a property tax exemption for the 2007 assessment date for land and improvements owned by a church that failed to file an exemption application for that year. Authorizes a property tax exemption for the 2006 assessment date for personal property, land, and improvements owned by a social service center that failed to file an exemption application for that year. Permits a taxpayer to file or refile a property tax exemption application under the exemption statutes available for sorority and fraternity property or for charitable property generally with respect to exemptions for the 2006, 2007, 2008, and 2009 assessment dates. Restricts the persons who are eligible to file a late property tax exemption application under the authority of P.L.182-2009(ss), SECTION 479.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax exemption application filing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2010-01-26 Cosponsor: Senator Broden
2010-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Merritt and Breaux
2010-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: Yeas 97, Nays 0
2010-01-25 Amendment 1 (Clere), prevailed; Roll Call 61: Yeas 78, Nays 11
2010-01-25 Amendment 2 (Clere), failed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Amendment 3 (Saunders), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-12 Representative Turner added as coauthor
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Herrell

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback