IN HB1144 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 248
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

South Shore rail transit. Establishes a rail transit corridor in northwest Indiana. Specifies that the main line double tracking project and the West Lake corridor improvement project are considered rail projects. Permits the northwest Indiana regional development authority (NWIRDA) to establish transit development districts containing a train station or regular train stop within the corridor, including new stations or stops along the West Lake corridor. Provides that a county that is not a member of the NWIRDA may participate in the rail projects and the benefits of a transportation development district under certain conditions. Allows such a county to participate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Shore rail transit. Establishes a rail transit corridor in northwest Indiana. Specifies that the main line double tracking project and the West Lake corridor improvement project are considered rail projects. Permits the northwest Indiana regional development authority (NWIRDA) to establish transit development districts containing a train station or regular train stop within the corridor, including new stations or stops along the West Lake corridor. Provides that a county that is not a member of the NWIRDA may participate in the rail projects and the benefits of a transportation development district under certain conditions. Allows such a county to participate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Dvorak) failed (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 248
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 510: yeas 49, nays 1
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 521: yeas 96, nays 4
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Hershman, Niezgodski, Charbonneau, Melton and Mishler
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Soliday, Heine, Olthoff, Pressel, Bauer, Candelaria Reardon, Dvorak, Harris and Moseley
2017-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Tallian
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Slager and Pelath
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateSenators Doriot and Mrvan added as cosponsors
2017-04-06SenateSenators Zakas and Bohacek added as cosponsors
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 412: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-23SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2017-03-13SenateSenator Mishler added as cosponsor
2017-03-13SenateSenator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
2017-03-06SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-23HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2017-02-23HouseRepresentative Pelath added as coauthor
2017-02-23HouseRepresentatives Heine, Braun, Harris, Cherry, Sullivan, Mayfield, Negele, Olthoff, Pressel, Soliday added as coauthors
2017-02-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2017-02-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer, Hershman and Tallian
2017-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 84, nays 8
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #1 (Dvorak) failed; Roll Call 195: yeas 37, nays 55
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-14HouseRepresentatives Leonard, Siegrist, Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
2017-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Slager

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1144/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/9/d/e89daac2/HB1144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/8/9/d789bffa/HB1144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/a/5/8fa58d09/HB1144.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/b/4/b6b4791d/HB1144.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/0/2/e802b1bb/HB1144.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/3/c/873c0ce4/HB1144.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/b/d/0dbdfcd1/HB1144.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/4/f/324f603d/HB1144.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/b/2/c2b23441/HB1144.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/f/2/f5f263ef/HB1144.195.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/4/1/ec413e2c/HB1144.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/4/8374487b/HB1144.219.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/0/d/bd0d63cf/HB1144.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/e/f/47ef83a6/HB1144.412.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/9/f/ab9fdabb/HB1144.510.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/0/b/680b9273/HB1144.521.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback