IN HB1141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 202
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Traffic amnesty program. Establishes a temporary traffic amnesty program to permit certain persons owing unpaid traffic fines, or who may be required to pay a fee for reinstatement of driving privileges, to obtain a reduction in the amount owed or amount payable. Specifies that a person seeking a reduction in fees owed is not required to pay a court filing fee. Provides that as part of the traffic amnesty program a person must: (1) pay the driving privileges reinstatement fee to the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau); (2) provide proof of financial responsibility to the court; and (3) not be ineligible to have the person's driving privileges reinstated. Provides that the court must transmit a copy of its order to the bureau in a manner prescribed by the bureau. Specifies that a petition for traffic amnesty is not an admission of guilt, and requires a court to include in its order granting amnesty that the order is not a conviction, finding of guilt, or finding of liability. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic amnesty program. Establishes a temporary traffic amnesty program to permit certain persons owing unpaid traffic fines, or who may be required to pay a fee for reinstatement of driving privileges, to obtain a reduction in the amount owed or amount payable. Specifies that a person seeking a reduction in fees owed is not required to pay a court filing fee. Provides that as part of the traffic amnesty program a person must: (1) pay the driving privileges reinstatement fee to the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau); (2) provide proof of financial responsibility to the court; and (3) not be ineligible to have the person's driving privileges reinstated. Provides that the court must transmit a copy of its order to the bureau in a manner prescribed by the bureau. Specifies that a petition for traffic amnesty is not an admission of guilt, and requires a court to include in its order granting amnesty that the order is not a conviction, finding of guilt, or finding of liability. Makes a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 202
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 617: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 585: yeas 44, nays 4
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Young M and Ford J.D.
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Taylor G
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sullivan, Young J, Beck and Hatcher
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Negele and Shackleford
2019-04-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 42, nays 5
2019-03-28SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-28SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Taylor G
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 87, nays 1
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentative Young J added as coauthor
2019-01-15HouseRepresentatives Negele and Hatcher added as coauthors
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Shackleford

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1141/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/b/e/f3be7559/HB1141.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/2/0/652081ba/HB1141.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/f/8/77f8fa73/HB1141.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/9/e/c29e53fd/HB1141.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/1/dcf14cdf/HB1141.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/2/9/fa296f86/HB1141.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/3/2/bc3280fd/HB1141.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/f/6/a3f6600e/HB1141.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/3/6/e936b89f/HB1141.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/6/2/4a62a98b/HB1141.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/7/7/a7775298/HB1141.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/0/5/c10577e7/HB1141.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/f/f/c7ffbacf/HB1141.166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/a/0/40a0504e/HB1141.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/5/9/9b59b694/HB1141.350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/b/2/0eb2037b/HB1141.585.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/c/3/e4c364ab/HB1141.617.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback