IN HB1141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Representative Goodin added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Representative Goodin added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Regional infrastructure development. Authorizes a regional development authority (RDA) to apply for a "FASTLANE" grant from the Federal Highway Administration (or a grant from any other federal grant program) for highway funding. Authorizes an RDA to enter into a supplemental funding agreement with the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) or a political subdivision to contribute local matching funds to be used to pay a part or all of the nonfederal share of the costs necessary to carry out regional transportation infrastructure projects. Allows INDOT, when determining its long range construction program, to give special priority to construction projects for which
Title
Regional infrastructure development. Authorizes a regional development authority (RDA) to apply for a "FASTLANE" grant from the Federal Highway Administration (or a grant from any other federal grant program) for highway funding. Authorizes an RDA to enter into a supplemental funding agreement with the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) or a political subdivision to contribute local matching funds to be used to pay a part or all of the nonfederal share of the costs necessary to carry out regional transportation infrastructure projects. Allows INDOT, when determining its long range construction program, to give special priority to construction projects for which
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Braun |