IN HB1141 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judgment dockets. Specifies that the clerk of a circuit court: (1) shall keep a judgment docket for the circuit court and for each superior court and probate court served by the clerk; and (2) is the official keeper of the judgment docket for the circuit court and for each superior court and probate court served by the clerk. Provides that a judgment docket may not include judgments in which the state, a county, or another governmental entity is the sole creditor, except for: (1) cases in which the state obtains a judgment for unpaid taxes; or (2) any entry that
Title
Judgment dockets. Specifies that the clerk of a circuit court: (1) shall keep a judgment docket for the circuit court and for each superior court and probate court served by the clerk; and (2) is the official keeper of the judgment docket for the circuit court and for each superior court and probate court served by the clerk. Provides that a judgment docket may not include judgments in which the state, a county, or another governmental entity is the sole creditor, except for: (1) cases in which the state obtains a judgment for unpaid taxes; or (2) any entry that
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Public Law 55 |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Head added as second sponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Washburne and DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Steele added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Richardson |