IN HB1141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the state police department (and not the Indiana criminal justice institute) maintains the methamphetamine laboratory web site (web site). Provides that a property used for the manufacture of methamphetamine may not be placed on the web site until 180 days after the methamphetamine laboratory is reported to the state police department, and specifies that the state police department may not place a property on the web site if it was decontaminated before being placed on the web site. Provides that a property must be removed from the web site in accordance with the statute that requires the web site to be established. Specifies that if methamphetamine is manufactured in an apartment of a multi-unit complex, only the specific unit in which the methamphetamine was manufactured may be included on the web site. Requires a person who manufactures methamphetamine on property owned by another person to pay restitution to the owner for the owner's actual damages, including lost rents and the costs of decontamination.
Title
Methamphetamine lab disclosure in property sales.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 114103 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 114101 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 114101 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 114103 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 114101 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 114101 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 180 |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 398: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 449: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Head added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Riecken added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Koch added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Ober added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Macer added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative McNamara added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 301: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HB 1141 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HB 1141 Amendment #2 (Head), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Head added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 181: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1141 Amendment #1 (McNamara), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara. |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Ober, Kubacki |