IN HB1140 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid coverage for pregnant women. Repeals the statute specifying Medicaid eligibility for qualified pregnant women. Increases the Medicaid income eligibility requirements for pregnant women. Removes the Medicaid limitation for pregnant women of medical assistance coverage only for pregnancy related services. Provides that the extension of postpartum Medicaid coverage for pregnant women shall be determined by the office of the secretary of family and social services and must be at least 60 days but not more than 12 months beginning on the last day of the pregnancy.
Title
Medicaid coverage for pregnant women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 117 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Donato and Yoder |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Becker and Breaux |
2022-02-28 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-02-25 | House | House advisors appointed: Rowray, Ledbetter, Karickhoff, Fleming and Shackleford |
2022-02-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Vermilion and Summers |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Campbell added as coauthor |
2022-02-22 | House | Rule 105.2 suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senators Young M, Tomes, Busch, Bassler added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau and Bohacek added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senators Leising and Yoder added as cosponsors |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Representatives Negele, Fleming, Shackleford, Pack R, Hamilton, Boy, Klinker, Jackson, Pfaff, Schaibley, Engleman, Ziemke, Pryor, Hatcher, King J, Rowray E, Davis M, Austin, Bauer M, Mayfield, Errington added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | House | Rule 105.2 suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Donato, Breaux |
2022-01-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 86, nays 1 |
2022-01-18 | House | Representatives Olthoff, Ledbetter C, Summers added as coauthors |
2022-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Vermilion |