IN HB1140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transitions of newly elected officials. Requires the department of local government finance (department) and the state board of accounts (board) to work with local government associations to develop a checklist that describes, for each elected local office, the information relating to that local office that is important and useful for a successor to that local office to have access to before the successor assumes office. Requires an incumbent of a local elected office to provide to the successor, not later than 14 days after the successor's election is certified, access to the information described by the department and the board. Provides that not later than 14 days after the successor requests access to information relating to the local office, other than information described in the checklist developed by the department and the board, the incumbent shall provide the successor access to that information unless federal or Indiana law otherwise prohibits the successor's access to the information before the successor assumes the office. Provides that if an incumbent denies access to information to which the successor is required or requested to have access, the successor has a cause of action to mandate the incumbent to provide the information. Makes a change to a provision regarding the transfer of records used in the preparation of an annual report by a township executive (executive) whose term expires to require that the new executive provide the former executive access to the records necessary in the preparation of the former executive's annual report.
Title
Transitions of newly elected officials. Requires the department of local government finance (department) and the state board of accounts (board) to work with local government associations to develop a checklist that describes, for each elected local office, the information relating to that local office that is important and useful for a successor to that local office to have access to before the successor assumes office. Requires an incumbent of a local elected office to provide to the successor, not later than 14 days after the successor's election is certified, access to the information described by the department and the board. Provides that not later than 14 days after the successor requests access to information relating to the local office, other than information described in the checklist developed by the department and the board, the incumbent shall provide the successor access to that information unless federal or Indiana law otherwise prohibits the successor's access to the information before the successor assumes the office. Provides that if an incumbent denies access to information to which the successor is required or requested to have access, the successor has a cause of action to mandate the incumbent to provide the information. Makes a change to a provision regarding the transfer of records used in the preparation of an annual report by a township executive (executive) whose term expires to require that the new executive provide the former executive access to the records necessary in the preparation of the former executive's annual report.
Sponsors
Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Thomas Saunders [R] | Rep. Chris Chyung [D] |
Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Representative Chyung added as coauthor |
2019-01-29 | House | Representatives Engleman and Saunders added as coauthors |
2019-01-29 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2019-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Pryor |