IN HB1140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of correction (department) to create policies that provide for a schedule of progressive parole incentives and violation sanctions, including judicial review procedures, and submit the policies to the parole board for review. Requires the parole board to review and approve the policies submitted by the department. Provides that if a parolee commits a new: (1) Level 1 felony or Level 2 felony, the parole board shall revoke parole; and (2) Level 3 felony, Level 4 felony, Level 5 felony, or Level 6 felony, the parole board may revoke parole. Provides that a parolee may be subject to progressive parole violation sanctions under certain circumstances.
Title
Parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 114002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Floor - (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 114001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 114002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Floor - (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 114001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 179 |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 392: yeas 75 and nays 14 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 241: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senator M. Young added second sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47; yeas 81, nays 15 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Tomes added as sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan. |
2014-01-09 | House | Representatives McMillin and Lawson added as coauthors. |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Lawson L |