IN HB1139 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Pension thirteenth checks. Provides for thirteenth checks in 2019 and 2020 for certain members of the: (1) Indiana state teachers' retirement fund; (2) public employees' retirement fund; (3) state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan; (4) state police pre-1987 benefit system; and (5) state police 1987 benefit system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension thirteenth checks. Provides for thirteenth checks in 2019 and 2020 for certain members of the: (1) Indiana state teachers' retirement fund; (2) public employees' retirement fund; (3) state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan; (4) state police pre-1987 benefit system; and (5) state police 1987 benefit system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Boots and Niezgodski
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-01-24HouseRepresentatives Hamilton and Barrett added as coauthors
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseRepresentative Gutwein added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback