IN HB1137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bail agent license renewal and bond forfeiture. Decreases the bail agent renewal fee from $600 to $300. Requires forfeiture, not earlier than 120 days or later than 365 days after the defendant's failure to appear, of a bond executed through cash or securities deposited with the clerk of court. (Current law requires forfeiture not earlier than 120 days after failure to appear.) Provides that the supreme court should adopt rules to establish the Indiana pretrial risk assessment system before January 1, 2020, to assist courts in assessing an arrestee's likelihood of: (1) committing a new criminal offense; or (2) failing
Title
Bail agent license renewal and bond forfeiture. Decreases the bail agent renewal fee from $600 to $300. Requires forfeiture, not earlier than 120 days or later than 365 days after the defendant's failure to appear, of a bond executed through cash or securities deposited with the clerk of court. (Current law requires forfeiture not earlier than 120 days after failure to appear.) Provides that the supreme court should adopt rules to establish the Indiana pretrial risk assessment system before January 1, 2020, to assist courts in assessing an arrestee's likelihood of: (1) committing a new criminal offense; or (2) failing
Sponsors
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 187 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 509: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2017-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 520: yeas 97, nays 1 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Bray added as conferee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as advisor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Young M removed as conferee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Melton and Glick |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Mrvan |
2017-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Hamm, Borders, Carbaugh and DeLaney |
2017-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Austin |
2017-04-17 | House | Concurrence withdrawn; House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-12 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 411: yeas 44, nays 3 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second sponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young M |
2017-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | House | Representatives Austin and Carbaugh added as coauthors |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |