IN HB1136 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance matters. Requires gaming facilities to pay to the state a special worker's compensation fee and removes a requirement for gaming facilities to reimburse the state for certain worker's compensation expenses. Amends the application of the annual audited financial report law to domestic insurers. Specifies that an insurer is not prevented from making available a named driver exclusion in a commercial motor vehicle policy. Provides for suspension of a nonresident insurance producer license and a nonresident public adjuster license if the home state license is not effective in good standing. Specifies certain requirements for a domestic insurer that is part
Title
Insurance matters. Requires gaming facilities to pay to the state a special worker's compensation fee and removes a requirement for gaming facilities to reimburse the state for certain worker's compensation expenses. Amends the application of the annual audited financial report law to domestic insurers. Specifies that an insurer is not prevented from making available a named driver exclusion in a commercial motor vehicle policy. Provides for suspension of a nonresident insurance producer license and a nonresident public adjuster license if the home state license is not effective in good standing. Specifies certain requirements for a domestic insurer that is part
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 72 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 410: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 373: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Walker, Lanane and Smith J |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Mrvan |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Borders, Mayfield and Austin |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and Hale |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2016-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Amendment #3 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | House | Representative Hamm added as coauthor |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2016-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Carbaugh and Hale |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |