IN HB1135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Midwives.
Title
Midwives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bauer), failed (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bauer), failed (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 232 |
2013-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 555: yeas 38, nays 12 |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 624: yeas 70, nays 25 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops and Bray |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Pat Miller and Breaux |
2013-04-15 | House | House advisor appointed: Crouch and Bauer |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehe and C. Brown |
2013-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 423: yeas 28 and nays 22 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 4 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 63, nays 32 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 4 (Bacon), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 1 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 5 (Bauer), failed; Roll Call 172: yeas 44, nays 52 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 3 (Lehe), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 2 (Lehe), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Frizzell, C. Brown and Turner |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |