IN HB1135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state educational institutions to grant postsecondary level academic credit that counts toward meeting the student's graduation requirements to students who receive a satisfactory score on an advanced placement examination. Requires the department of education, in cooperation with other appropriate associations, to develop a uniform job description for school counselors.
Title
Advanced placement exams; school counselors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 91 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor | |
2010-03-05 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 283: Yeas 47, Nays 3 | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 306: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Head and Sipes | |
2010-03-01 | Senate conferee appointed: Kruse and Rogers | |
2010-02-25 | House advisors appointed: V. Smith, Robertson, Noe and Thompson | |
2010-02-25 | House conferees appointed: Porter and Behning | |
2010-02-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2010-01-26 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Rogers | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: Yeas 96, Nays 1 | |
2010-01-21 | Amendment 3 (Behning), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Representatives Behning, V. Smith and Noe added as coauthors | |
2010-01-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Porter |