IN HB1134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Drug addiction workforce recovery program. Requires the division of mental health and addiction (division) to establish a drug addiction workforce recovery program (program). Provides that the program is to assist employers who have recently hired or offered to hire individuals who are qualified for employment with the employer and have failed an initial drug screening, to employ the individual if the individual agrees to participate in a drug education and addiction treatment program as a condition of employment. Establishes requirements for the program. Provides that the division may allow an employer to deduct from the employee's wages to pay for
Title
Drug addiction workforce recovery program. Requires the division of mental health and addiction (division) to establish a drug addiction workforce recovery program (program). Provides that the program is to assist employers who have recently hired or offered to hire individuals who are qualified for employment with the employer and have failed an initial drug screening, to employ the individual if the individual agrees to participate in a drug education and addiction treatment program as a condition of employment. Establishes requirements for the program. Provides that the division may allow an employer to deduct from the employee's wages to pay for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Goodin added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Bartels added as coauthor |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson |