IN HB1131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Utility matters. Makes the following changes for purposes of a statute that subjects a water or wastewater utility organized after June 30, 2018, to the jurisdiction of the Indiana utility regulatory commission (IURC) with regard to certain aspects of the water or wastewater utility's operations for a period of 10 years: (1) Provides that the term "water or wastewater utility" includes a municipally owned utility that provides water service to less than 8,000 customers. (2) Deletes references to organization of a water or wastewater utility as a legal entity. Requires the IURC, in a rate case for a water or wastewater utility that extends service to an infrastructure development zone at the request of the governmental entity that established the infrastructure development zone, to approve inclusion in the water or wastewater utility's rate schedule of a surcharge payable only within the geographic area of the infrastructure development zone. (Under current law, such a surcharge must apply within the entire jurisdiction of the governmental entity.) Provides that, with respect to any water main extension or wastewater main extension, a utility shall comply with the IURC's rules governing water main extensions or wastewater main extensions, regardless of whether the utility is subject to the IURC's jurisdiction for the approval of rates and charges. Provides that a dispute arising over a water main extension or wastewater main extension may be submitted as an informal complaint to the IURC's consumer affairs division, regardless of whether the person requesting the extension is a customer of the utility involved. Provides that, if the IURC determines that it requires additional staff to handle the volume of informal complaints submitted, the IURC may impose a fee on a party against whom a decision is rendered. Provides that the fee may not exceed: (1) the IURC's actual costs in administering the informal complaint; or (2) $750. Provides that certain procedures for acquisition by a municipal utility of property of another utility apply to acquisition by a nonmunicipal utility of property of another utility, and prescribes requirements regarding appraisal of the value of utility property acquired by a nonmunicipal utility. Provides, for purposes of the factors the IURC must consider in determining whether a utility that acquires property of an offered utility may include the cost differential of the offered utility's property as part of the acquiring utility's rate base, that an offered utility is too small to capture economies of scale or is not furnishing or maintaining adequate, efficient, safe, and reasonable service and facilities if the IURC finds that the offered utility serves fewer than 8,000 customers (rather than 5,000 customers under current law). Provides: (1) that a city meeting certain population parameters may annex territory: (A) that is not contiguous to the city; (B) that is south of the southernmost boundary of the city; (C) the entire area of which is not more than four miles from the city's boundary; and (D) that does not extend more than one mile to the east of a state highway; (2) that the annexed territory is not considered a part of the city for purposes of annexation of additional territory; and (3) that the city may not require connection to a sewer installed to provide service to the annexed territory. Provides that certain provisions regarding approval of sewage disposal and treatment fees apply to a sanitation district that: (1) is located in a county that meets specified population parameters; and (2) is under an order or party to an agreement with one or more state or federal agencies to remediate environmental conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 160
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 378: yeas 41, nays 6
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 384: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateSenator Garten added as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Garten removed as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Garten and Randolph Lonnie M
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Boots and Ford J.D.
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, DeVon and Hatfield
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Pressel and Pierce
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 49, nays 1
2020-03-03SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Heine added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Garten
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Pressel) prevailed;
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2020-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representative Soliday
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1131/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/2/c/9e2cf3ce/HB1131.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/5/2/4052e3c4/HB1131.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/1/8/e6187abe/HB1131.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/2/5/0725c788/HB1131.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/2/6/1b268104/HB1131.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/c/2/19c271a5/HB1131.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/2/b/382b5c6b/HB1131.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/2/e/5c2e0547/HB1131.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/a/9/aba9dc2b/HB1131.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/4/c/094c8a53/HB1131.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/b/9/e6b9302a/HB1131.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/3/6/b43660f0/HB1131.84_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/9/0/6690181f/HB1131.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/1/a/c41affe7/HB1131.289_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/1/5/8f15f8c0/HB1131.378_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/5/a/315a566a/HB1131.384_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback