IN HB1131 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Errington added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Errington added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in: (1) public places; (2) enclosed areas of a place of employment; and (3) certain state vehicles. Provides exceptions for certain businesses. Requires the alcohol and tobacco commission to enforce the prohibition. Requires signs to be posted at the public entrance of public places and businesses to provide notice that the facility either allows or does not allow smoking. Makes it a Class B infraction to violate the smoking prohibition and a Class A infraction if the person has three unrelated prior offenses. Allows certain governmental units to adopt smoking ordinances. Repeals the current clean indoor air law that prohibits smoking in public buildings.
Title
Smoking ban in public places.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Senator Errington added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Senator Rogers | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Dillon, Skinner and Becker | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: Yeas 73, Nays 26 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 18 (Messmer), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 5 (Ruppel), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 10 (Thompson), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 16 (Bell), failed; Division of the House: Yeas 47, Nays 50 | |
2010-02-01 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 8 (Clere), prevailed; Roll Call 56: Yeas 54, Nays 38 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 2 (Tyler), prevailed; Division of the House: Yeas 52, Nays 42 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: amended, call withdrawn | |
2010-01-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2010-01-07 | Coauthored by Representatives Turner, Welch and Sullivan | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative C. Brown |