IN HB1130 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Senator Leising removed as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protections for student journalists. Provides freedom of speech and freedom of press protections for grades 9 through 12 and state educational institution student journalists. Requires each school corporation and charter school to adopt a policy concerning student journalist protections. Provides that a public school or school corporation may not suppress school sponsored media unless certain conditions apply. Provides that public schools, school corporations, and state educational institutions are immune from civil liability for any injury resulting from school sponsored media produced by a student journalist except for acts or omissions that constitute gross negligence or willful, wanton, or intentional misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protections for student journalists. Provides freedom of speech and freedom of press protections for grades 9 through 12 and state educational institution student journalists. Requires each school corporation and charter school to adopt a policy concerning student journalist protections. Provides that a public school or school corporation may not suppress school sponsored media unless certain conditions apply. Provides that public schools, school corporations, and state educational institutions are immune from civil liability for any injury resulting from school sponsored media produced by a student journalist except for acts or omissions that constitute gross negligence or willful, wanton, or intentional misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateSenator Leising removed as cosponsor
2017-04-04SenateSenator Bassler added as cosponsor
2017-04-04SenateSenator Grooms added as cosponsor
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateSenators Ruckelshaus, Becker, Glick, Leising, Stoops added as cosponsors
2017-04-03SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2017-03-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-20SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2017-03-13SenateSenator Kruse added as third sponsor
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Hershman and Melton
2017-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 88, nays 4
2017-02-20HouseRepresentative Lucas added as coauthor
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-14HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2017-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-01-05HouseCoauthored by Representative DeLaney
2017-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1130/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/7/5/2a75478a/HB1130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/0/70c04bcb/HB1130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/b/f/10bfded7/HB1130.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/a/d/62adf7b7/HB1130.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/9/f/569fdcdf/HB1130.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/7/f/7e7f667a/HB1130.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/4/9/c8499daa/HB1130.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/d/6/89d69b08/HB1130.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/7/4/24748b00/HB1130.171.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/5/7cc53c1a/HB1130.02.COMH.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback