IN HB1130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Immediate detention.
Title
Immediate detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 4 |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-02-18 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Pat Miller and Hume |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2013-01-14 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2013-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative Bacon |
2013-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative C. Brown |