IN HB1130 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 65(b), reassigned to Tax and Fiscal Policy.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 65(b), reassigned to Tax and Fiscal Policy.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a third area in Delaware County for designation as a community revitalization enhancement district (CRED). Provides that the area must contain a building with at least 1,000,000 square feet, and that at least 700 fewer people are employed in the area than were employed in the area on January 1, 2008.
Title
CRED districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Lutz [R] | Rep. Dennis Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 65(b), reassigned to Tax and Fiscal Policy. | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Paul added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Gard added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2010-01-26 | Senate sponsor: Senator Errington | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: Yeas 89, Nays 6 | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Representative Lutz added as coauthor | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Small Business and Economic Development | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Tyler |